EP0979111 - OPTICAL DETECTION AND QUANTIFICATION OF MICROAIR IN BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. 7000 Central Avenue Northeast Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DRIEL, Michael, R. Apartment Number 147, 16425 Harbor Boulevard Fountain Valley, CA 92708 / US | 02 /
FLORES, Juan, Carlos 7718 Jaboneria Road Bell Gardens, CA 90201 / US | 03 /
INGLE, Aaron, S. 1800 Carters Drive Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US | 04 /
JORGE, Jeffery 9208 San Antonio Avenue North C. South Gate, CA 90280-2929 / US | 05 /
MEYER, Craig, R. 404 South Cecilia Avenue Muncie, IN 47303 / US | 06 /
WONG, Yu-Tung 16891 Bolero Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92649-3027 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913065.3 | 24.03.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998US05726 | Priority number, date | US19970841015 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: US 841015 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848867 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979111 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979111 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
A61M1/3626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE ERKENNUNG UND QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON MIKROBLÄSCHEN IN BLUT | [2000/07] | English: | OPTICAL DETECTION AND QUANTIFICATION OF MICROAIR IN BLOOD | [2000/07] | French: | DETECTION ET QUANTIFICATION OPTIQUES DE BULLES D'AIR MICROSCOPIQUES DANS LE SANG | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 02.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.05.2006 | ES | 12.05.2006 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/46] | SE | 01.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3812482 (CLARK J) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4280495 (LAMPERT SEYMOUR R) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0467805 (HOSPAL AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0706044 (HOSPAL IND [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * |