EP1018999 - SELF-TEXTURING ABSORBENT STRUCTURES AND ABSORBENT ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Fung-jou 3216 White Birch Lane Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 02 /
LINDSAY, Jeffrey, Dean 20 Diane Lane Appleton, WI 54915 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913258.4 | 27.03.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998US06175 | Priority number, date | US19970848353 | 21.04.1997 Original published format: US 848353 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9847455 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1018999 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018999 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A61F13/53 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/5323 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/53717 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/53747 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/53756 (KR);
A61F13/5376 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | SELBSTEXTURIERENDE, ABSORBIERENDE STRUKTUREN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE ABSORBIERENDE ARTIKEL | [2000/29] | English: | SELF-TEXTURING ABSORBENT STRUCTURES AND ABSORBENT ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM | [2000/29] | French: | STRUCTURES ABSORBANTES A TEXTURATION SPONTANEE ET ARTICLES ABSORBANTS FABRIQUES A PARTIR DESDITES STRUCTURES | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 14.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 24.11.2004 | FR | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | SE | 24.02.2005 | ES | 06.03.2005 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | BE | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | BE | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | ES | 06.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5149332 (WALTON RICHARD R [US], et al) [X] 1-12,19,20,24-26,30-32,35,36,42-46,52 * column 15, line 29 - column 18, line 6; figures 22-25; claim - *; | [A]WO9711660 (PARAGON TRADE BRANDS INC [US]) [A] 1,30,36,43 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2296438 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5397316 (LAVON GARY D [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3544420 (MURPHY JAMES A, et al) [A] 54-56 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 71 - column 4, line 33 *; | [A]US3424643 (LEWIS FRANK M JR, et al) [A] 54 * figure 5; claim 1 *; | [A]US3775230 (HILTON R) [A] 54 * the whole document * | by applicant | CA2197485 | US5607551 | US5672248 | US5048589 | US5348620 |