EP0971862 - LIGHTWEIGHT SUBSTANCE MOLDED BODY, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Gips-Schüle-Stiftung Waiblingerstrasse 12 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Gips-Schüle-Stiftung Waiblingerstrasse 12 70372 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Gips-Schüle-Stiftung Waiblingerstrasse 12 70372 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖDEKE, Holger Mörikestrasse 14 D-88480 Achstetten / DE | 02 /
WERNER, Jürgen Viereichenweg 33 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
BABUKE, Gerhard Neuffenstrasse 11 D-71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98913718.7 | 13.03.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998EP01485 | Priority number, date | DE19971012835 | 26.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19712835 | [2000/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842633 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971862 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971862 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/26 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
C04B28/26 (EP);
C04B38/08 (EP);
F01N2310/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B20/002, C04B40/0268 (EP);
C04B38/08, C04B38/0038 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | FORMKÖRPER AUS EINEM LEICHTWERKSTOFF, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2000/03] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT SUBSTANCE MOLDED BODY, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2000/03] | French: | CORPS MOULE EN MATERIAU LEGER, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE PRODUIRE ET SON UTILISATION | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 01.10.2003 | IE | 01.10.2003 | DK | 01.01.2004 | GR | 01.01.2004 | SE | 01.01.2004 | ES | 12.01.2004 | PT | 01.03.2004 | LU | 13.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2005/23] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
LU | 13.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0959077 ; | [A]JPH092881 ; | [X]DE2034449 (TRASSWERKE MEURIN) [X] 1 * page 1 - page 2; claim 1 *; | [X]DE2252488 (BULLINGER FRIEDRICH HEINRICH D) [X] 1,7,8,11,13,14,17 * page 2 * * page 6 - page 7; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3217260 (KNIPSM SAVODPROEKT [BG]) [A] 1,8,13 * examples 1-4 *; | [X]GB2166427 (BROWN KENNETH MCKENZIE) [X] 1,6-8,11,13,14 * column 1; claims 10,11 *; | [X]EP0658528 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,8 * column 3 - column 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 097, no. 007, & JP09059077 A 19970304 (RIBOOLE:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, & JP09002881 A 19970107 (RIBOOLE:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |