EP0971987 - INK COMPOSITION CONTAINING AT LEAST TWO AZO DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avecia Limited Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVERY, Aidan, Joseph, c/o Felix Schoeller Ltd. Woodburn Green High Wycombe, Buckinghamshire HP10 ODB / GB | 02 /
MEYERS, John, Parker Zeneca Specialist Colours Chemical Engineering Labs 233 Cherry Lane New Castle, DE 19720 / US | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Mayall, John, et al Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House, Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Mayall, John, et al Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [2000/03] | Mayall, John, et al Intellectual Property Group, Avecia Limited, PO Box 42, Hexagon House, Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913924.1 | 26.03.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998GB00930 | Priority number, date | GB19970006580 | 01.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9706580 | GB19970017392 | 16.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9717392 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844053 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971987 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971987 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, C09D11/00 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
C09B67/0055 (EP,US);
C09D11/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/03] | Title | German: | TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND MINDESTENS ZWEI AZOFARBSTOFFE | [2000/03] | English: | INK COMPOSITION CONTAINING AT LEAST TWO AZO DYES | [2000/03] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENCRE CONTENANT DEUX COLORANTS AZOIQUES | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.07.2002 | FR | 17.07.2002 | LI | 17.07.2002 | DE | 18.10.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/46] | CH | 17.07.2002 | |
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 17.07.2002 | |
LI | 17.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0356080 (ICI PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,15-20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0565286 (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [A] 1,15-20* page 4, line 3 - line 8; claim - * |