EP1011211 - Receiver and method for coherent reception using received pilot symbols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/25] | BASE STATION APPARATUS OF MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2004/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8436 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Takehiro 4-18-4-1103, Nobi Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | 02 /
HAGIWARA, Junichiro Adorabure Kuriki#A-101, 2-35-3, Kuriki, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-0041 / JP | 03 /
NAKANO, Etsuhiro 2-13-9, Tsuruma, Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-0004 / JP | 04 /
OHNO, Koji 9-2-8-502, Sugita Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-0033 / JP | 05 /
ONOE, Seizo 1974-21, Mutsuura-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0032 / JP | 06 /
HIGASHI, Akihiro 5-306, 2-1-3, Hayashi Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 238-0315 / JP | 07 /
TAMURA, Motoshi 4-18-2-101, Nobi Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | 08 /
NAKANO, Masatomo Urban-hites Doshida B-412, 43-2, Tana-sho, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-0064 / JP | 09 /
KAWAKAMI, Hiroshi 4-18-2-203, Nobi Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | 10 /
MORIKAWA, Hiroki Greenheights #102, 3-4-18, Nishikubo Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98914086.8 | 17.04.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998JP01786 | Priority number, date | JP19970116192 | 17.04.1997 Original published format: JP 11619297 | [2000/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847246 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011211 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1011211 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04J13/00, H04L12/28, H04B1/707 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04J13/0022 (EP,US);
H04J13/0077 (EP,US);
H04J13/10 (EP,US);
H04J13/16 (EP,US);
H04W52/241 (EP,US);
H04W52/248 (EP,US);
H04W52/32 (KR);
H04W52/322 (EP,US);
H04W52/325 (EP,US);
H04W52/50 (EP,KR,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70703 (EP,US);
H04B7/2618 (EP,US);
H04J13/0029 (EP,US);
H04W52/08 (EP,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,US);
H04W52/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | H04B7/26, H04J13/00, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | Empfänger und Verfahren für den kohärenten Empfang mittels empfangener Pilotsymbole | [2004/26] | English: | Receiver and method for coherent reception using received pilot symbols | [2004/26] | French: | Récepteur et procédé pour réception cohérente utilisant des symboles pilotes reçus | [2004/26] |
Former [2000/25] | BASISSTATION FÜR MOBILE TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2000/25] | BASE STATION APPARATUS OF MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2000/25] | STATION DE BASE DE SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1999 | Translation filed | 21.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 06.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04077666.8 / EP1499039 | EP04077682.5 / EP1494372 | EP04077683.3 / EP1492254 | EP04077684.1 / EP1492368 | EP04077685.8 / EP1501218 | EP04077686.6 / EP1499036 | EP04077701.3 / EP1492376 | EP10165215.4 / EP2224623 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0565507 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [X] 20,21 * page 6, line 34 - line 45; claims 15,16 * [A] 22-26; | [XA]US5309474 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) [X] 12 * column 34, line 35 - line 46 * * column 35, line 20 - line 31 * * figure 11 * [A] 13; | [X]EP0652650 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 27-29 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 3 * * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 28 *; | [XA]WO9512943 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 12,13 * claims 1,4 * * page 12, line 12 - line 35; figure 1 * [A] 1-5; | [A]US5416797 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 22, line 16 - line 33 *; | [A]US5442625 (GITLIN RICHARD DENNIS [US], et al) [A] 27-29* column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 20; claim 7 *; | [A]WO9535002 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 27-29 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 13 * * page 9, line 1 - line 4 * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 9; figure 2 *; | [X]US5479397 (LEE WILLIAM C Y [US]) [X] 14,15 * column 16, line 36 - line 56 *; | [A]US5495498 (TOMINAGA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 31 - line 50; figures 4A,4B *; | [XA]GB2300337 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [X] 6-8,10,11 * page 23, line 4 - page 24, line 7 * * page 26, line 5 - line 19 * * page 33, line 2 - line 24 * * page 53, line 23 - line 25 * * page 57, line 6 - line 12; claim 1 * [A] 9; | [XA]US5596333 (BRUCKERT EUGENE J [US]) [X] 14 * column 8, line 8 - line 25 * * column 11, line 28 - line 49; claim 6 * [A] 15; | [A]WO9702665 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [A] 20-26 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 7 *; | [PX]EP0810742 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [PX] 16,19 * column 3, line 1 - line 52; figure 1 *; | [PXA]WO9750194 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [PX] 20,21 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 2 * * page 15, line 1 - line 15 * * figures 5-7; claims 17,18 * [A] 22,26; | [XA] - DOHI T ET AL, "EXPERIMENTS ON COHERENT MULTICODES DS-CDMA", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, (19960901), vol. E79B, no. 9, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 1326 - 1331, XP000636072 [X] 16,19 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * [A] 17,18 | International search | [A]JPH05506763 ; | [A]JPH06152487 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [X]JPH07170223 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH0832513 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH0851662 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH0879133 (AT & T CORP); | [A]JPH08125604 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH0946270 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]JPH0993220 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |