EP1015661 - ANODISING MAGNESIUM AND MAGNESIUM ALLOYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnesium Technology Limited 137 Captain Springs Road Onehunga Auckland / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Magnesium Technology Limited 137 Captain Springs Road Onehunga, Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MacCULLOCH, John, Arnold 4/568 Remuera Road Remuera, Auckland / NZ | 02 /
ROSS, Phillip, Nicholas 31 Lowther Place Taradale, Napier / NZ | 03 /
HENSHAW, Geoffrey, Stephen 3/153 Victoria Avenue Remuera, Auckland / NZ | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2000/27] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98914165.0 | 23.03.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998NZ00040 | Priority number, date | NZ19970314467 | 24.03.1997 Original published format: NZ 31446797 | NZ19970328316 | 11.07.1997 Original published format: NZ 32831697 | NZ19970328719 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: NZ 32871997 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842892 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015661 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/84, C25D11/30 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
C25D11/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | C23C22/84 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | MAGNESIUMANODISIERUNG UND MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNGEN | [2000/27] | English: | ANODISING MAGNESIUM AND MAGNESIUM ALLOYS | [2000/27] | French: | ANODISATION DU MAGNESIUM ET D'ALLIAGES AU MAGNESIUM | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 09.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/33] | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2000 | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4551211 (KOBAYASHI WAICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4620904 (KOZAK OTTO [US]); | [X]US4978432 (SCHMELING EDITH L [DE], et al); | [A]US5264113 (BARTAK DUANE E [US], et al); | [X]WO9628591 (IND RES LTD [NZ], et al) |