EP0916158 - LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT MATERIAL FOR USE AS AN INSULATION ELEMENT IN AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENMAYER, C., Thomas 1119 State Street Eau Claire, WI 54701 / US | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98914343.3 | 31.03.1998 | [1999/20] | WO1998US06191 | Priority number, date | US19970919586 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: US 919586 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9845880 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916158 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L23/532, H01L23/29, H01B3/44 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/0212 (EP,US);
H01L21/768 (KR);
H01B3/445 (EP,US);
H01L21/02203 (EP,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP,US);
H01L21/3127 (US);
H01L21/762 (EP,US);
H01L23/293 (EP,US);
H01L23/49894 (EP,US);
H01L23/5329 (EP,US);
H01L21/02304 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S428/901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31573 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31743 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/20] | Title | German: | ISOLATIONSMATERIAL MIT EINER KLEINEN DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTE FÜR HALBLEITERANWENDUNGEN | [1999/20] | English: | LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT MATERIAL FOR USE AS AN INSULATION ELEMENT IN AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [1999/20] | French: | MATERIAU A FAIBLE CONSTANTE DIELECTRIQUE CONVENANT COMME ELEMENT D'ISOLATION DANS UN DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | [1999/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 04.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 04.02.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0393682 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-44 * examples 6-8; claims 1-10 *; | [X]US5312716 (UNOKI MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-44 * examples 1,4; claims 1-17 *; | [X]US5442237 (HUGHES HENRY G [US], et al) [X] 1-44* column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 12; claims 1-8 *; | [PXL]EP0769788 (GORE & ASS [US]) [PXL] 1-44 * the whole document * * The above patent application was filed on 17 Oct. 1996 and seems to disclose the same invention as that of the present application. Thus the priority US No. * * 08/929586 of 4 April 1997 does not seem to be the "first application" contrary to the requirements of Art. 8 PCT and Art. 4 Paris Convention. * |