EP0976010 - WATERBORNE PHOTORESISTS MADE FROM URETHANE ACRYLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Coatings International Ltd. Kiryat Weizmann Science Park, Building 13A, Room 7 Nes Ziona 70400 / IL | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Steven, M. P.O. Box 58 Sloansville, NY 12160 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Ritscher, Thomas Ritscher & Partner AG Resirain 1 8125 Zollikerberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Ritscher, Thomas, Dr. RITSCHER & SEIFERT Patentanwälte Forchstrasse 452 Postfach 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98914614.7 | 09.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998US07015 | Priority number, date | US19970043752P | 09.04.1997 Original published format: US 43752 P | US19980056636 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: US 56636 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9845755 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976010 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976010 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/73, G03C1/74, G03F7/027, G03F7/028, G03F7/035, G03F7/36, G03F7/40 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
G03F7/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE PHOTORESISTS AUF URETHANACRYLAT-BASIS | [2000/05] | English: | WATERBORNE PHOTORESISTS MADE FROM URETHANE ACRYLATES | [2000/05] | French: | PHOTORESISTS AQUEUX CONSTITUES D'URETHANE ACRYLATES------------- | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2002 | 30.04.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | BE | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | FR | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | ES | 02.01.2005 | PT | 22.02.2005 | LU | 09.04.2005 | IE | 11.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
FR | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
LU | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 11.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
FR | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
LU | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 11.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
FR | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
IE | 11.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
FR | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
IE | 11.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
IE | 11.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1519013 (BASF AG) [X] 1-21 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 59 * * page 4, line 11 - line 55; example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0602292 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] * page 11, line 10 - line 39 ** page 12, line 41 - page 13, line 4 * | International search | [X]US4849321 (HUNG PAUL [US], et al); | [A]US4988605 (KUBOTA SHIGERU [JP], et al); | [A]US5089376 (SETTHACHAYANON SONGVIT [US]); | [Y]US5290663 (HUYNH-TRAN TRUC-CHI T [US]); | [A]US5341799 (FIFIELD CHARLES C [US], et al); | [A]US5536620 (DUEBER THOMAS E [US], et al); | [X]US5538821 (KAKINUMA MASAHISA [JP], et al); | [XP]US5728505 (DUEBER THOMAS EUGENE [US], et al) |