EP1009398 - MOLECULAR COMPLEX AND CONTROL-RELEASE OF ALPHA HYDROXYACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yu, Ruey J., Dr. 4 Lindenwold Avenue Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | For all designated states Van Scott, Eugene J., Dr. 3 Hidden Land Abington Pennsylvania 19001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Yu, Ruey J., Dr. 4 Lindenwold Avenue Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | ||
For all designated states Van Scott, Eugene J., Dr. 3 Hidden Land Abington Pennsylvania 19001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 98914628.7 | 10.04.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US07073 | Priority number, date | US19970842603 | 16.04.1997 Original published format: US 842603 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846217 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009398 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19, A61K31/195 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/542 (EP,US);
A61K47/549 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/57 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | MOLEKULAR KOMPLEXE UND KONTROLLIERTE FREIGABE VON ALPHA HYDROXYSÄUREN | [2000/25] | English: | MOLECULAR COMPLEX AND CONTROL-RELEASE OF ALPHA HYDROXYACIDS | [2000/25] | French: | COMPLEXES MOLECULAIRES ET LIBERATION PROGRESSIVE D'ALPHA-HYDROXYACIDES | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 16.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 02.07.2001 | Observations by third parties | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/27] | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9516659 (AVON PROD INC [US]) [A] * claim - * | International search | [X]US5425938 (ZNAIDEN ALEXANDER P [US], et al) | other | - POWERS, D.H., "Formulas for Dry Shampoos", POWERS, D.H., BALSAM M.S. AND SAGARIN E., Cosmetics, Science and Technolog, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, (1972), vol. 2, pages 82 - 117, XP002942371 | - "Hair Care Formulary: 2-in-1 and 3-in-1 Shampoos", COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, THE INTERNATIONAL MAGAZINE OF PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT SINCE 1906, CAROL STREAM, IL, USA, (199307), vol. 108, no. 7, pages 119 - 122, XP002942372 | - FLICK E.W., Cosmetic and Toiletry Formulations, PARK RIDGE, NEW JERSEY, US, NOYES PUBLICATIONS, (1989), pages 626 - 658, XP002942373 |