EP0963634 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR COMPUTER ASSISTED FORMATION OF A PERMUTATION TO PERMUTE DIGITAL SIGNALS AND METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT TO ENCRYPT DIGITAL SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICHLER, Franz Wolgauer Strasse 88 A-4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
SCHARINGER, Josef Beethovenstrasse 1 A-4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
SCHÜTT, Dieter Dachsteinstrasse 26a D-81825 München / DE | [1999/50] | Application number, filing date | 98914809.3 | 23.02.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998DE00537 | Priority number, date | DE1997107768 | 26.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19707768 | [1999/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9838767 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963634 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06, H04L9/34 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H04L9/0618 (EP);
H04L2209/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR RECHNERGESTÜTZTEN BILDUNG EINER PERMUTATION ZUR PERMUTIERUNG DIGITALER SIGNALE UND VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR VERSCHLÜSSELUNG DIGITALER SIGNALE | [1999/50] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR COMPUTER ASSISTED FORMATION OF A PERMUTATION TO PERMUTE DIGITAL SIGNALS AND METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT TO ENCRYPT DIGITAL SIGNALS | [1999/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FORMATION ASSISTEE PAR ORDINATEUR D'UNE PERMUTATION DESTINEE A FAIRE PERMUTER DES SIGNAUX NUMERIQUES, ET PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE CHIFFREMENT DE SIGNAUX NUMERIQUES | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 21.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0004340 (TEKADE) [A] 1,2,12,13 * page 3, line 14 - page 5, line 33 *; | [A]EP0410516 (TRT) [A] 1,2,12,13 * the whole document * | [X] - SCHUTT D ET AL, "Cryptographic permutations based on BOOT decompositions of Walsh matrices", COMPUTER AIDED SYSTEMS THEORY - EUROCAST '97. SELECTION OF PAPERS FROM THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON COMPUTER AIDED SYSTEMS THEORY. PROCEEDINGS, COMPUTER AIDED SYSTEMS THEORY - EUROCAST '97, ISBN 3-540-63811-3, 1997, BERLIN, GERMANY, SPRINGER-VERLAG,, (19970224), pages 580 - 590, XP002070120 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * |