EP0971928 - QUINOLINE-2(1H)-ONE AND DIHYDROQUINOLINE-2(1H)-ONE DERIVATIVES AS LIGANDS OF 5-HT, 5-HT2 AND 5-HT1-LIKE RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75635 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCORT, Gary 5, rue Dupont des Loges F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
HOORNAERT, Christian 49, avenue Aristide Briand F-92160 Antony / FR | 03 /
CADILHAC, Caroline 11, rue des Potiers F-92260 Fontenay aux Roses / FR | 04 /
DUCLOS, Olivier 10, rue de la Cerisaie F-91360 Villemoisson/Orge / FR | 05 /
GUILPAIN, Eric 4, rue Foch F-77590 Chartrettes / FR | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi-Synthélabo Service Brevets 174, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98914928.1 | 17.03.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998FR00528 | Priority number, date | FR19970003387 | 20.03.1997 Original published format: FR 9703387 | [2000/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842712 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971928 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/04, A61K31/47, C07D401/12, C07D471/04, C07D513/04, C07F9/12, // (C07D513/04, 285:00, 221:00),(C07D471/04, 241:00) | [2000/03] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP);
C07D491/04 (EP);
C07D513/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | CHINOLIN-2-ON- UND DIHYDROCHINOLIN-2-ON-DERIVATE ALS LIGANDEN DES REZEPTOREN 5-HT,5-HT2 UND 5-HT1-LIKE | [2000/03] | English: | QUINOLINE-2(1H)-ONE AND DIHYDROQUINOLINE-2(1H)-ONE DERIVATIVES AS LIGANDS OF 5-HT, 5-HT2 AND 5-HT1-LIKE RECEPTORS | [2000/03] | French: | DERIVES DE QUINOLEIN-2(1H)-ONE ET DE DIHYDROQUINOLEIN-2(1H)-ONE EN TANT QUE LINGANDS DES RECEPTEURS 5-HT, 5-HT2 ET 5-HT1-LIKE | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 30.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0364327 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) [DY] 1,9,10 * examples 14,21 *; | [Y]GB2174703 (BRISTOL-MEYERS COMPANY) [Y] 1,9,10 * document complet *; | [PY]WO9710238 (SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [PY] 1,9,10 * document complet *; | [PY]FR2738823 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) [PY] 1,9,10 * document complet * |