EP0977495 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING PECTIN METHYL ESTERASE AND TWO SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREIBERG, Jette, Dina Dueholm 18 DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | 02 /
CHRISTENSEN, Tove, Martel, Ida, Elsa Soeengen 30 DK-3450 Alleroed / DK | 03 /
HYTTEL, Susanne Ingerslev Boulevard 22, st.tv. DK-8000 Arhus C / DK | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98915049.5 | 24.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998IB00673 | Priority number, date | GB19970008278 | 24.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9708278 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847391 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977495 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977495 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0524 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C12Y301/01011 (EP,US);
A23L29/06 (EP,US);
A23L21/12 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/43] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, WELCHE PEKTINMETHYLESTERASE UND ZWEI SUBSTRATE BEINHALTET | [2000/06] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING PECTIN METHYL ESTERASE AND TWO SUBSTRATES | [2000/06] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE LA PECTINE METHYLE ESTERASE ET DEUX SUBSTRATS | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | GR | 26.01.2006 | SE | 26.01.2006 | ES | 06.02.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | IE | 24.04.2006 | LU | 24.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
LU | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9309683 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [X] 1-23 * examples 1-5 *; | [X]WO9412055 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 4, line 28 - line 35; example 1 *; | [XPD]WO9731102 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [XPD] 1-23* page 16, line 35 - page 17, line 22 * |