EP0943170 - PAIRED MULTI-LAYERED DIELECTRIC INDEPENDENT PASSIVE COMPONENT ARCHITECTURE RESULTING IN DIFFERENTIAL AND COMMON MODE FILTERING WITH SURGE PROTECTION IN ONE INTEGRATED PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X2Y Attenuators, L.L.C. 1812 Navy Street Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | [1999/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anthony, Anthony A. 4511 West Lake Road Erie, PA 16505 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Makovski, Priscilla Mary, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Spall, Christopher John BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98915364.8 | 08.04.1998 | [1999/38] | WO1998US06962 | Priority number, date | US19970841940 | 08.04.1997 Original published format: US 841940 | US19980008769 | 19.01.1998 Original published format: US 8769 | US19980056379 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: US 56379 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9845921 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943170 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/00 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01G4/012 (EP,US);
H01L23/552 (EP,US);
H03H1/0007 (EP,US);
H01C7/18 (EP,US);
H01G4/35 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US);
H03H2001/0014 (EP,US);
H05K1/141 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H05K3/3436 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | ARCHITEKTUR MIT PAARWEISE MEHRLAGIG ANGEORDNETEN DIELEKTRISCH UNABHÄNGIGEN PASSIVEN KOMPONENTEN ZUR DIFFERENTIAL- UND GLEICHTAKTFILTERUNG MIT ÜBERSPANNUNGSSCHUTZ IN EINER INTEGRIERTEN PACKUNG | [1999/38] | English: | PAIRED MULTI-LAYERED DIELECTRIC INDEPENDENT PASSIVE COMPONENT ARCHITECTURE RESULTING IN DIFFERENTIAL AND COMMON MODE FILTERING WITH SURGE PROTECTION IN ONE INTEGRATED PACKAGE | [1999/38] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE COMPOSANTS MULTICOUCHE JUMELES PASSIFS A DIELECTRIQUES DISTINCTS, ASSURANT UN FILTRAGE EN MODE COMMUN ET DIFFERENTIEL, A LIMITEUR DE SURTENSION DANS UN BOITIER INTEGRE | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 18.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4494092 (GRIFFIN ALAN L [US]) [X] 12-14,16,19,22,26,30,34-36 * column 2, lines 58-68 * * column 3, lines 5-9,14-23 * * figures 24,5-8,12,13 *; | [X]US5483407 (ANASTASIO PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 16 * abstract * * figures 4,5 * * column 4, lines 29,43,44 * * column 6, lines 8-11 *; | [A]USRE35064E (HERNANDEZ JORGE M [US]) [A] 12-14,16,19,22,26,30,34-36 * abstract * * figure 13 *; | [A]EP0623363 (MAXWELL LAB INC [US]) [A] 12-14,16,19,22,26,30,34-36 * column 6, lines 18,19,32,33 * * column 11, lines 29-40 * * figures 14-16 * | International search | [A]US3842374 (SCHLICKE H); | [A]US4262317 (BAUMBACH BERTRAM W); | [A]US4335417 (SAKSHAUG EUGENE C, et al) |