EP0973936 - COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES OF PEPTIDOMIMETIC AMINOTHIOETHER ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENDEL, David 11348 Woods Bay Lane Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Burnside, Ivan John, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Burnside, Ivan John, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2001/15] | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilly Research Center, Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2000/04] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98915437.2 | 08.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US07151 | Priority number, date | US19970043496P | 11.04.1997 Original published format: US 43496 P | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846786 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973936 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/556, A01N1/02 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP);
B01J19/0046 (EP);
C07C323/52 (EP);
C07C323/59 (EP);
C07C323/62 (EP);
C07K1/047 (EP);
B01J2219/00286 (EP);
B01J2219/00308 (EP);
B01J2219/00423 (EP);
B01J2219/00585 (EP);
B01J2219/00596 (EP);
B01J2219/00599 (EP);
B01J2219/0072 (EP);
B01J2219/00725 (EP);
C40B40/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | KOMBINATORISCHE BIBLIOTHEKEN VON PEPTIDOMIMETISCHEN AMINOTHIOETHER-SÄUREN | [2000/04] | English: | COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES OF PEPTIDOMIMETIC AMINOTHIOETHER ACIDS | [2000/04] | French: | ECHANTILLOTHEQUES COMBINATOIRES D'ACIDES D'AMINOETHERS PEPTIDOMIMETIQUES | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 29.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/20] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0181779 ; | [X]EP0177054 ; | [X] - HORNER L., ET AL., "FLUORESZIERENDE UND NICHT FLUORESZIERENDE (ARYL)(VINYL)SULFONE - REAGENZIEN ZUM SCHUTZ UND NACHWEIS VON THIOLFUNKTIONEN.", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE., VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH. WEINHEIM., DE, DE, (19850101), no. 01., ISSN 0170-2041, pages 22 - 33., XP002910103 | [X] - FELDER E., ET AL., "THE CAMET AND CASET LINKS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF PROTECTED OLIGOPEPTIDES AND OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDES ON SOLID AND SOLUBLE SUPPORTS.", Helvetica Chimica Acta, Verlag Helvetica Chimica Acta., CH, CH, (19840101), vol. 67., doi:10.1002/hlca.19840670518, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1316 - 1327., XP002910104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19840670518 |