EP0975392 - ULTRASOUND APPLICATION DEVICE FOR ACCELERATING STERNUM HEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exogen, Inc. P.O. Box 6860, 10 Constitution Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Exogen, Inc. P.O. Box 6860, 10 Constitution Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALISH, Roger, J. 5 Harman Court Hillsborough, NJ 08876 / US | 02 /
ROSE, Emery 31-77 32 Street Astoria, NY 11106 / US | 03 /
LUND, Signe, M. 306 Enclave Lane Bedminstor, NJ 07921 / US | 04 /
WRIGHT, Frederic, S. 2950 Belmont Avenue Ardmore, PA 19003 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98915580.9 | 16.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998US07532 | Priority number, date | US19970044710 | 18.04.1997 Original published format: US 44710 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847569 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975392 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
A61N7/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLAPPLIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUR BESCHLEUNIGTEN BRUSTBEINHEILUNG | [2000/05] | English: | ULTRASOUND APPLICATION DEVICE FOR ACCELERATING STERNUM HEALING | [2000/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION D'ULTRASONS POUR ACCELERER LA GUERISON DU STERNUM | [2004/20] |
Former [2000/05] | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION D'ULTRASONS POUVANT ACCELERER LA CICATRISATION D'UN STERNUM | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/12] | 12.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4530360 (DUARTE LUIZ R [BR]) [A] 12,18* the whole document *; | [A]EP0324711 (DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 12,18 * claims 1,3,4 *; | [YA]WO9503744 (SONEX INT CORP [US], et al) [Y] 12,14,15 * figure 4 * [A] 18; | [YA]EP0695559 (LAZZARI AMBROGIO [IT], et al) [Y] 12,14,15 * abstract * [A] 18; | [A]WO9612519 (ORTHOLOGIC CORP [US], et al) [A] 12,18 * claim 23 *; | [A]US5520612 (WINDER ALAN A [US], et al) [A] 12,18 * column W * | by applicant | US4530360 | US4792336 | US4802477 | US5139498 | US5163598 | US5330489 | US5520612 |