EP0904576 - POWER SUPPLY CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTH, Michael Bleichestrasse 18 D-73230 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
KÖHLER, Dietmar Schillerstrasse 23 D-72649 Wolfschlugen / DE | 03 /
MEROTH-LIENKAMP, Andrea Otto-Fischer-Weg 22 D-72766 Reutlingen / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Bernd Odenwaldstrasse 6 D-72766 Reutlingen / DE | 05 /
LACHER, Steffen Anne-Frank-Strasse 35 D-72764 Reutlingen / DE | [1999/13] | Application number, filing date | 98916836.4 | 04.03.1998 | [1999/13] | WO1998DE00622 | Priority number, date | DE1997110440 | 13.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19710440 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9840803 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904576 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904576 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/59, G05F3/26 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G05F1/59 (EP,US);
G05F3/26 (EP,US);
H02J1/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/13] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSSCHALTUNG | [1999/13] | English: | POWER SUPPLY CIRCUIT | [1999/13] | French: | MONTAGE D'ALIMENTATION EN COURANT | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 07.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0316781 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US4617473 (BINGHAM DAVID [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0465933 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [DA] - TIETZE U, SCHENK CH, Halbleiter-Schaltungstechnik, BERLIN, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1990), 17110, XP002073243 [DA] 1-9 * paragraph [4.6.3] * |