EP0981270 - CUP CONVEYOR FOR A POTATO PLANTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oy Juko Ltd. Opintie 4 23100 Mynämäki / FI | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIKAINEN, Esko Lankinen FIN-23100 Mynämäki / FI | 02 /
PALMUJOKI, Lauri Tavastintie 2 as 5 FIN-23120 Mietoinen / FI | 03 /
RAUHALA, Olli Vahdontie 29 FIN-21270 Nousiainen / FI | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Öhman, Ann-Marie Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Öhman, Ann-Marie Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 98917174.9 | 04.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998FI00376 | Priority number, date | FI19970001926 | 06.05.1997 Original published format: FI 971926 | [2000/09] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849884 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981270 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01C9/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A01C9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | BECHERKETTE FÜR KARTOFFELLEGEMASCHINEN | [2000/09] | English: | CUP CONVEYOR FOR A POTATO PLANTER | [2000/09] | French: | TRANSPORTEUR A GODETS POUR PLANTEUSE DE POMMES DE TERRE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1998 | Translation filed | 28.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/49] | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1816650 (STOLL MASCHF GMBH WILHELM); | [A]WO9111899 (KVERNELAND UNDERHAUG AS [NO], et al); | [A]DE321226 (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA); | [A]DE229451 ; | [X]DE700572 (FRANTISEK MARTINOVSKY); | [A]DE279746 |