EP0928061 - NEUTRAL-POINT INVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippo Electric Co., Ltd. 15-23, Miyamatsu-cho Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states NIPPON ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 15-23, Miyamatsu-cho, Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken, 254-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUTSU, Kenzo Nippo Electric Co., Ltd. 15-23, Miyamatsu-cho Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254-0036 / JP | 02 /
EBATO, Koji Nippo Electric Co., Ltd. 15-23, Miyamatsu-cho Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254-0036 / JP | 03 /
KATO, Yoshito 8-3, Shinhonzi-machi Tottori-shi Tottori-ken 680-0812 / JP | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98917615.1 | 22.04.1998 | [1999/27] | WO1998JP01836 | Priority number, date | JP19970104563 | 22.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10456397 | [1999/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848506 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928061 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H05B41/24 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
H02M1/425 (EP,US);
H02M7/538 (EP,US);
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
H05B41/2825 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1999/27] | Title | German: | NULLPUNKT-WECHSELRICHTER | [1999/27] | English: | NEUTRAL-POINT INVERTER | [1999/27] | French: | ONDULEUR A POINT NEUTRE | [1999/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1998 | Translation filed | 21.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 10.02.2006 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.02.2006 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04193066 ; | [Y]JPH08275547 ; | [A]JPH0191672 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921027), vol. 016, no. 521, Database accession no. (E - 1285), & JP04193066 A 19920713 (MATSUSHITA WORKS) [Y] 1,2 * column A; figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08275547 A 19961018 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION) [Y] 1,2 * column A; figure 11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890721), vol. 013, no. 325, Database accession no. (E - 792), & JP01091672 A 19890411 (TOSHIBA ELECTRIC EQUIP.) [A] 1,2 * column A * | International search | [A]JPH04193066 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JPS58501348 |