EP0977009 - METHOD OF DISCRIMINATING SHAPE ERRORS OF FREE-FORM CURVED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIKEN 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200, Ishida, Isehara-shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states RIKEN 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | ||
For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200, Ishida, Isehara-shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | |||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Riken 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | ||
For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200, Ishida, Isehara-shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | |||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Riken 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | ||
For all designated states AMADA METRECS COMPANY, LIMITED 806, Takamori, Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASE, Kiwamu-The Ins. of Physical and Chem. Res. 2-1, Hirosawa, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 02 /
MAKINOUCHI, Akitake The Ins. of Physical and Chemical Res., Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 03 /
KONDO, Tetsuya Amada Metrecs Co., Ltd.,806, Takamori Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Naomichi Amada Metrecs Co., Ltd.,806, Takamori Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98917621.9 | 22.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998JP01842 | Priority number, date | JP19970109139 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10913997 | [2000/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849524 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977009 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977009 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/20, G06T17/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
G06T17/30 (EP,US);
G01B21/20 (EP,US);
Y10S715/964 (US)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | G01B21/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETERMINIERUNG VON FEHLERN IM FORM EINER WILLKÜRLICHEN KRUMMEN OBERFLACHE | [2000/05] | English: | METHOD OF DISCRIMINATING SHAPE ERRORS OF FREE-FORM CURVED SURFACE | [2000/05] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ETABLIR UNE DISTINCTION ENTRE DES ERREURS DE FORME D'UNE SURFACE COURBE A FORME LIBRE | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1999 | Translation filed | 21.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.10.2007 | CH | 17.10.2007 | FI | 17.10.2007 | LI | 17.10.2007 | NL | 17.10.2007 | [2009/15] |
Former [2008/40] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 17.10.2007 | |
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PANKANTI S ET AL, "Robust feature detection for 3D Object Recognition and Matching", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19930712), vol. 2031, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 366 - 377, XP002211019 [X] 1-5 * page 372 - page 374 * * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.146640 | [A] - TANAKA H T ET AL, "Curvature-based face surface recognition using spherical correlation-principal directions for curved object recognition", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PRESS LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (1996), vol. 3, ISBN 0-8186-7282-X, pages 638 - 642 vol.3, XP002391855 [A] 1-5 * page 539 - page 541 * | [A] - HUANG X ET AL, "Localization and comparison of two free-form surfaces", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN ELSEVIER UK, (199612), vol. 28, no. 12, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 1017 - 1022, XP002391856 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4485(96)00011-5 | International search | [A]JPH04276513 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |