EP0977922 - SWEEPING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISAB Vacuum Technology AB Skiffervägen 44 224 78 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Disab Vacuum Technology AB Skiffervägen 44 224 78 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖVGREN, Gert, Axel Apotekarevägen 15 S-237 32 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
HAUGEN, Karl, Thorbjörn Blentarpsvägen 31 S-270 35 Blentarp / SE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 98917931.2 | 22.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998SE00725 | Priority number, date | SE19970001520 | 23.04.1997 Original published format: SE 9701520 | [2000/06] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848116 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977922 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977922 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E01H1/08 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
E01H1/0845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2004/15] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KEHRMASCHINE | [2000/06] | English: | SWEEPING MACHINE | [2000/06] | French: | BALAYEUSE MECANIQUE | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1998 | Translation filed | 23.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.12.2002 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 09.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Request for further processing for: | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | FR | 07.04.2004 | IT | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | IE | 22.04.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | ES | 18.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FR | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
IE | 22.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
IE | 22.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
IE | 22.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US932195 (VERSCHUREN AUGUSTE [BE]); | [A]DE647863 (HEINRICH SCHOERLING); | [A]DE925777 (STREICHER FA M); | [A]SE345492 (ERIKSSON J [SE]); | [A]SE463509 (BRODDWAY AB [SE]) |