EP0985013 - SOFTENER ACTIVE DERIVED FROM ACYLATED TRIETHANOLAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHL, Errol, Hoffman 8021 Deershadow Lane Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
TRINH, Toan 8671 Creekwood Lane Maineville, OH 45039 / US | 03 /
CARR, Eugene, Robert 912 W. Fairmont Drive Peoria, IL 61614 / US | 04 /
MACDONALD, Jim 2104 Erin Lane Nashville, TN 37221 / US | 05 /
LIU, Zaiyou 8040 Stone Barn Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 06 /
CHUNG, Alex, Haejoon 8854 Edgeridge Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services SA, 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2000/11] | Gault, Nathalie, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 98918506.1 | 15.04.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998US07986 | Priority number, date | US19970044719P | 19.05.1997 Original published format: US 44719 P | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847991 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985013 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/00, C07C219/08 | [2000/11] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | VON ACYLIERTEN TRIETHANOLAMIN ABGELEITETE WEICHMACHER | [2000/11] | English: | SOFTENER ACTIVE DERIVED FROM ACYLATED TRIETHANOLAMINE | [2000/11] | French: | AGENT ADOUCISSANT DERIVE DE TRIETHANOLAMINE ACYLE | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/44] | 08.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3915867 (KANG HYUNG H ET AL) [X] 1,11 * column 2, line 34 - line 39; claim -- * * column 3, line 49 - line 61; example A *; | [X]EP0370675 (KAO CORP) [X] 1,3,10,11 * see compound 3-1 in table 1 and composition 12 of table 2;; claims 1-3,8 *; | [X]WO9117974 (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1-4,11 * examples 2,3; table 1 *; | [AP]WO9734972 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [AP] 1-11 * claims 1,2,5-8,11-15 *; | [A]WO9321291 (HENKEL KGAA ;KIHN BOTULINSKI MARTINA (DE); VOELKEL THEODOR (DE); P) [A] 1-4,11 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0498050 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [A] 1,10,11 * example -; claims 1-9 * |