EP1040181 - DISC ASSAY DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WICKERT, Peter, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Michael, G. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98918567.3 | 22.04.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US08092 | Priority number, date | US19970997337 | 23.12.1997 Original published format: US 997337 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932601 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040181 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/20 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
C12M23/04 (EP);
C12M23/12 (EP);
C12M23/20 (EP);
C12M41/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENNACHWEISVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2000/40] | English: | DISC ASSAY DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE | [2000/40] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE DOSAGE A DISQUES ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0656420 (SHOWA PHARM CHEM IND) [X] 1-3,7-10 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]EP0795600 (SHOWA PHARM CHEM IND) [X] 1-5,7-10 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]US3010880 (M.L. LITTMAN ET AL.) [X] 1-3,7-10 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]DE4218917 (SCHMITZ KLAUS PETER DR ING HAB ;BEHREND DETLEF DR ING (DE); DITTRI) [Y] 6 * claim - * |