EP0977503 - RECLOSABLE FASTENER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. Johnson Home Storage, Inc. 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403 / US | [2000/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORCHIA, Jose 3614 Windsor Court Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
DAIS, Brian, C. 368 East Saginaw Road Sanford, MI 48657 / US | 03 /
TONEY, Kenneth, A. 3712 Sweetbrier Midland, MI 48642 / US | 04 /
WELSH, Judi, R. 5007 Foxpoint Circle Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98918644.0 | 24.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998US08216 | Priority number, date | US19970846082 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: US 846082 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848655 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977503 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977503 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/16, A44B19/26, B65D33/25 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
B65D33/2541 (EP,US);
A44B19/16 (EP,KR,US);
A44B19/267 (EP,US);
A44B19/36 (EP,US);
B31B70/8131 (EP,US);
Y10S24/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARER VERSCHLUSS | [2000/06] | English: | RECLOSABLE FASTENER ASSEMBLY | [2000/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE FIXATION REUTILISABLE | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 15.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 30.07.2003 | IT | 30.07.2003 | DK | 30.10.2003 | GR | 30.10.2003 | SE | 30.10.2003 | LU | 24.04.2004 | IE | 26.04.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/24] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
LU | 24.04.2004 | ||
IE | 26.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
LU | 24.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 30.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1345580 (FLEXICO FRANCE SARL) [A] 1,5,6,8,9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [AD]US3173184 (STEVEN AUSNIT) [AD] 1,12* column 3, paragraph 2 - column 4, paragraph 4; figures 1-7 *; | [XDA]US5442837 (MORGAN KEVIN P [US]) [XD] 1-3,5,6,12 * column 3, line 28 - column 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 * [A] 9,10; | [PX]US5664299 (PORCHIA JOSE [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, paragraph 2; figures 1-7; claims 1-18 * |