EP0973847 - SYNTHESIS GAS GENERATOR WITH COMBUSTION AND QUENCH CHAMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MG Technologies AG Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states mg technologies ag Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Metallgesellschaft Aktiengesellschaft Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖHNEN, Klaus Luxemburger Allee 49 D-45481 Mülheim / DE | 02 /
DEEKE, Wolfgang Haydnstrasse 152 D-40822 Mettmann / DE | 03 /
HEERING, Jürgen Rheindamm 13 D-40668 Meerbusch / DE | 04 /
GRUHLKE, Wolfram Rosenstrasse 44 D-47918 Toenis-Vorst / DE | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98919418.8 | 08.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998IB00803 | Priority number, date | DE1997114376 | 08.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19714376 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9845388 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0973847 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973847 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/48 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C10J3/485 (EP,US);
C10J3/48 (KR);
C10J3/506 (EP,US);
C10J3/84 (EP,US);
C10J3/845 (EP,US);
C10K1/101 (EP,US);
C10J2200/09 (EP,US);
C10J2200/152 (KR);
C10J2300/093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/04] | Title | German: | SYNTHEGASERZEUGER MIT BRENN- UND QUENCHKAMMERN | [2000/04] | English: | SYNTHESIS GAS GENERATOR WITH COMBUSTION AND QUENCH CHAMBERS | [2000/04] | French: | GENERATEUR DE GAZ DE SYNTHESE COMPRENANT DES CHAMBRES DE COMBUSTION ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT RAPIDE | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2002 | GB | 08.04.2002 | ES | 09.04.2002 | [2004/28] |
Former [2003/47] | AT | 08.04.2002 | |
GB | 08.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 08.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2650512 (SIEGENER AG GEISWEID) [A] 1,9 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4605423 (KOOG WOLFGANG [US]) [A] 1,9* columns 9-12; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0284762 (BABCOCK WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,10 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 21 *; | [A]DE4001739 (FREIBERG BRENNSTOFFINST [DD]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 52 *; | [A]DE4230124 (BABCOCK ENERGIE UMWELT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 47 * |