EP0913267 - THERMAL RECORDING MATERIAL AND NOVEL CRYSTAL OF BISPHENOL S DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONISHI, Masao 6-11-15, Kamiochiai Yono-shi Saitama 338-0001 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Masaaki 3-56-2, Nakano Kamocho Fukuyama-shi Hiroshima 720-2411 / JP | 03 /
IWAMOTO, Hirofumi 102, Minomicho Fukuyama-shi Hiroshima 720-0832 / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98919574.8 | 13.05.1998 | [1999/18] | WO1998JP02103 | Priority number, date | JP19970138011 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13801197 | JP19970138012 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13801297 | JP19970138013 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13801397 | [1999/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851511 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913267 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913267 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26, C07C317/22 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
B41M5/3336 (EP,US);
B41M5/26 (KR);
C07C317/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/18] | Title | German: | WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL UND NEUES BISPHENOL-S-KRISTALLDERIVAT | [1999/18] | English: | THERMAL RECORDING MATERIAL AND NOVEL CRYSTAL OF BISPHENOL S DERIVATIVE | [1999/18] | French: | MATERIAU DE THERMOGRAVURE ET NOUVEAU CRISTAL DE DERIVE DE BISPHENOL S | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1998 | Translation filed | 21.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 15.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS60208286 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK); | [A]JPS6189090 (NIKKA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS6253957 (NIKKA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH02282343 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPH05301854 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JPH06107623 (NIKKA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH06143826 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) |