EP0932286 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND GAME SYSTEM CONSTRUCTED BY USING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12, Haneda, 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8531 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12, Haneda, 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8531 / JP | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12, Haneda, 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIIZUMA, Naoki, Sega Enterprises, Ltd. 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8531 / JP | 02 /
HIMOTO, Atunori, Sega Enterprises, Ltd. 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8531 / JP | [2005/29] |
Former [1999/30] | 01 /
NIIZUMA, Naoki, Sega Enterprises, Ltd. 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-0043 / JP | ||
02 /
HIMOTO, Atunori, Sega Enterprises, Ltd. 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-0043 / JP | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/30] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98919599.5 | 14.05.1998 | [1999/30] | WO1998JP02134 | Priority number, date | US19970046461P | 14.05.1997 Original published format: US 46461 P | JP19970127654 | 16.05.1997 Original published format: JP 12765497 | [1999/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852331 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932286 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932286 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/00, H04L25/02, G06F13/38, H04L12/28, H04Q9/00, H01R24/00, H01R24/02, H04L25/14 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
H04L7/0008 (EP);
H04L69/00 (KR);
H04L25/14 (EP);
H01R2107/00 (EP);
H01R2201/06 (EP);
H01R24/60 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | H04L29/00, H04L25/02, G06F13/38, H04L12/28, H04Q9/00, H01R24/00, H01R23/02, H04L25/14 | ||
Former IPC [2001/04] | H04L29/00, H04L25/02, G06F13/38, H04L12/28, H04Q9/00, H01R23/00, H01R23/02, H04L25/14 | ||
Former IPC [2000/31] | H04L29/00, H04L25/02, G06F13/38, H04L12/28, H04Q9/00, H01R23/00, H01R23/02 | ||
Former IPC [1999/30] | H04L29/00, H04L25/02, G06F13/38, H04L12/28, H04Q9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/30] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND FÜR DAS VERFAHREN KONSTRUIERTES SPIELSYSTEM | [1999/30] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND GAME SYSTEM CONSTRUCTED BY USING THE METHOD | [1999/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES, ET SYSTEME DE JEU CONSTRUIT SELON LEDIT PROCEDE | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1999 | Translation filed | 13.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 13.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 13.01.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02197066 ; | [XAY]US3909541 (BOBILIN RICHARD THOMAS) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 34 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, line 47; figures 1,3 * [A] 4-35 [Y] 3; | [X]EP0268441 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 60,61 * page 4, column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 18; figure 1 * * page 6, column 9, line 9 - line 19 * * page 6, column 10, line 13 - line 39; figure 8 *; | [YA]EP0378401 (IBM [US]) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 27; figure 2 * [A] 4-7; | [A]FR2704987 (BAJEUX CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 62-64* page 1, line 1 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0684058 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [A] 8-35 * abstract * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 46 * * column 7, line 33 - line 49 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 34 *; | [X]WO9632831 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [X] 62-64 * page 4, line 1 - line 16; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP0834962 (ELSAG INT NV [NL]) [PX] 62-64 * page 3, column 4, line 45 - page 4, column 5, line 55; figures 6-11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901018), vol. 014, no. 479, Database accession no. (E - 0992), & JP02197066 A 19900803 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 60,61 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS5688342U ; | [A]JPS62232233 (RICOH KK); | [X]JPH04167896 (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS); | [A]JPH0946378 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) |