EP1016125 - VEHICLE LAMPS WITH IMPROVED FILAMENT AND FILAMENT SUPPORT CONFIGURATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COUSHAINE, Charles, M. 56 Birch Drive Rindge, NH 03461 / US | 02 /
TUCKER, Michael, D. 5 Morse Circle Henniker, NH 03242 / US | 03 /
ENGLISH, George, J. 34 Hillside Road Reading, MA 01867 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Jung HML Patentanwälte Hofmarkstrasse 10 - Arnhofen 86447 Aindling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen 86447 Aindling / DE | Application number, filing date | 98919934.4 | 28.04.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US08506 | Priority number, date | US19970044255P | 28.04.1997 Original published format: US 44255 P | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849717 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016125 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016125 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01K9/08, H01K1/18 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H01K1/18 (EP,US);
F21S41/164 (EP,US);
H01K1/26 (EP,US);
H01K9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGE MIT VERBESSERTER GLÜHWENDEL UND GLÜHWENDELHALTERUNGSGESTALTUNG | [2000/27] | English: | VEHICLE LAMPS WITH IMPROVED FILAMENT AND FILAMENT SUPPORT CONFIGURATIONS | [2000/27] | French: | LAMPE POUR VEHICULE A FILAMENT AMELIORE ET A CONFIGURATIONS DE SUPPORT DE FILAMENT AMELIOREES | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Request for further processing for: | 11.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/28] | BE | 26.08.2009 | |
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | NL | 26.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0500340 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,12,13,15 * the whole document * [A] 3-10,16-21; | [A]US4180755 (NIXON ROY A JR [US]) [A] 1-10,12,13,15-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5187405 (RACHEL BERNARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-10,12,13,15-21 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH08306342 ; | [A]DE1589412 (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE) [A] 1,2,11-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US5578893 (YAMAMOTO TERUAKI [JP]) [A] 1,2,12,13,15-18 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, & JP08306342 A 19961122 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,2,12,13,16-18 * abstract * |