EP0920498 - HAMSTER EF-1ALPHA TRANSCRIPTIONAL REGULATORY DNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/23] | HAMSTER EF-1$g(a) TRANSCRIPTIONAL REGULATORY DNA | ||
[1999/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICOS Corporation 22021 20th Avenue S.E. Bothell WA 98201 / US | [2006/15] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states ICOS Corporation 22021 20th Avenue S.E. Bothell WA 98201 / US | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states ICOS CORPORATION 22021 20th Avenue, S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLISON, Daniel, S. 3612 N.E. 189th Place Seattle, WA 98155 / US | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98920128.0 | 01.05.1998 | [1999/23] | WO1998US08906 | Priority number, date | US19970847218 | 01.05.1997 Original published format: US 847218 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849289 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0920498 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0920498 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/67, C12N15/85, C12N15/90, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C07K14/47, A01K67/027 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
C12N15/67 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/23] | Title | German: | EF-1-ALPHA TRANSKRIPTIONSREGULATORISCHE DNA AUS HAMSTER | [1999/52] | English: | HAMSTER EF-1ALPHA TRANSCRIPTIONAL REGULATORY DNA | [1999/52] | French: | ADN REGULATEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION DU GENE EF-1ALPHA DU HAMSTER | [2000/30] |
Former [1999/23] | EF-1-g(a) TRANSKRIPTIONSREGULATORISCHE DNA AUS HAMSTER | ||
Former [1999/23] | HAMSTER EF-1$g(a) TRANSCRIPTIONAL REGULATORY DNA | ||
Former [1999/23] | ADN REGULATEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION DU GENE EF-1$g(a) DU HAMSTER | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06003954.2 / EP1676916 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.03.2006 | LU | 01.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | LU | 01.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5266491 (NAGATA SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [DA] - HAYASHI Y ET AL, "Anchoring of peptide elongation factor EF-1alpha by phosphatidylinositol at the endoplasmic reticulum membrane", J. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 106, pages 560 - 563, XP002077407 [DA] * figure 3 * | [A] - EDAMATSU H ET AL, "Inducible high-level expression vector for mammalian cells, pEF -LAC carrying human elongation factor 1alpha promoter and lac operator", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, (19970318), vol. 187, no. 2, page 289-294, XP004056993 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(96)00768-8 |