EP0983328 - MULTIZONE DOWNCOMER FOR SLURRY HYDROCARBON SYNTHESES PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US | ||
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVINESS, Stephen, C. 1850 Cloverdale Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2000/10] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98920246.0 | 05.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998US09142 | Priority number, date | US19970851868 | 06.05.1997 Original published format: US 851868 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850493 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983328 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983328 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C10G2/00, B01J8/22 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
C10G2/34 (EP,US);
C10G2/00 (KR);
B01J8/006 (EP,US);
B01J8/226 (EP,US);
C07C1/066 (EP,US);
C07C2523/40 (EP,US);
C07C2523/74 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/10] | Title | German: | MEHRZONENRÜCKLAUFVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFSYNTHESE IN SUSPENSION | [2001/32] | English: | MULTIZONE DOWNCOMER FOR SLURRY HYDROCARBON SYNTHESES PROCESS | [2000/10] | French: | DEVERSOIR MULTIZONE POUR SYNTHESE D'HYDROCARBURES DANS UNE SUSPENSION | [2000/10] |
Former [2000/10] | MEHRZONE ABFLÜSSVORRICHTUNG ZUM SLURRYKOHLENWASSERSTOFFVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 09.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2000 | 31.05.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5382748 (BEHRMANN WILLIAM C [US], et al) |