EP0979207 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING BARRELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS Till GmbH Kapellenstrasse 47-49 65830 Kriftel / DE | [2000/52] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states GEA Till GmbH & Co. Kapellenstrasse 47-49 D-65830 Kriftel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TILL, Volker Eichendorffstrasse 17 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
WALL, Hans-Jürgen An den Schwatzen 49 D-88138 Weissensberg / DE | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 98920505.9 | 08.04.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998EP02058 | Priority number, date | DE19971018130 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19718130 | DE19971041254 | 18.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19741254 | [2000/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849089 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979207 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979207 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/32, B67C3/20 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
B67C3/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, NL [2000/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜLLEN VON GEBINDEN | [2000/07] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING BARRELS | [2000/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REMPLIR DES FUTS | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 27.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2116530 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH) [X] 1,2,5-8 * claim - *; | [A]EP0117449 (KOLBUS GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]GB2182319 (GKN SANKEY LTD); | [X]EP0274338 (CYEMSA CONST Y ESTRUC METAL SA [ES]) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 41; figure 1 * |