EP0977952 - A ROLLER BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF (publ) S-415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2000/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLSTRÖM, Magnus Ensittarevägen 30 S-433 41 Partille / SE | 02 /
KULLIN, Jonas Barekulla 563 S-438 91 Landvetter / SE | 03 /
FOGELSTRÖM, Joacim Nyhagen 45 S-427 35 Billdal / SE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Westman, Per Börje Ingemar SKF Group Headquarters Innovation & Patents 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Westman, P. Börje I. SKF Group Headquarters Innovation & Patents S-415 50 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98920769.1 | 22.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998SE00726 | Priority number, date | SE19970001551 | 24.04.1997 Original published format: SE 9701551 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848189 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977952 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977952 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/36, F16C23/08, F16C19/36 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
F16C23/088 (EP,US);
F16C19/26 (EP,US);
F16C23/08 (EP,US);
F16C33/36 (EP,US);
F16C2240/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/06] | Title | German: | ROLLENLAGER | [2000/06] | English: | A ROLLER BEARING | [2000/06] | French: | ROULEMENT A ROULEAUX | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 28.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4802775 (TAKATA HIROTOSHI [JP]); | [A]US3910656 (PRICE CONNOR E, et al); | [A]GB2129066 (TORRINGTON CO); | [AP]US5752775 (TSUTSUI AKIRA [JP], et al) |