EP0984807 - MEDICAL LINE ANCHORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Venetec International, Inc. 12555 High Bluff Drive, Suite 170 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Venetec International, Inc. 12555 High Bluff Drive, Suite 170 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Venetec International, Inc. Suite 260, 27405 Puerta Real Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIERMAN, Steven, F. 143 Eighth Street Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 98921041.4 | 07.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998US09356 | Priority number, date | US19970865231 | 29.05.1997 Original published format: US 865231 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853872 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984807 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984807 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/02 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
A61M25/02 (EP,US);
A61M2025/024 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0246 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0253 (EP,US);
A61M2025/026 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0266 (EP,US);
Y10S128/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEMZUR VERANKERUNG EINER MEDIZINISCHEN LEITUNG | [2000/11] | English: | MEDICAL LINE ANCHORING SYSTEM | [2000/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION A USAGE MEDICAL | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05075542.0 / EP1537889 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2005 | BE | 09.03.2005 | CH | 09.03.2005 | FI | 09.03.2005 | LI | 09.03.2005 | NL | 09.03.2005 | CY | 07.05.2005 | LU | 07.05.2005 | IE | 09.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | SE | 09.06.2005 | DE | 10.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
LU | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
LU | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
CY | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
IE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3834380 (BOYD W) [X] 1,2,31 * column 3, line 2 - line 32; figures 4-6 * [A] 34,41,49,55; | [XY]US4193174 (STEPHENS THOMAS P [US]) [X] 1,19,21-23,49,52-54 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-6 * [Y] 41-44,46-48; | [XAY]US4397647 (GORDON MARVIN) [X] 1-6,9,12-14,16,29-33 * column 3, line 41 - column 7, line 68; figures 1-9 * [A] 34,49,55 [Y] 41-44,46-48; | [X]US4896465 (RHODES ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,6* column 4, line 10 - line 64; figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO9610435 (VENETEC INT INC [US]) [X] 1,9,10,12-14,16,17,19,20,24,34-37,39,40,49-51,53-58 * page 4, line 13 - page 7, line 34; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | US5306243 |