EP1017635 - REMOVAL OF CELL GROWTH FROM A BODY OF WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELFER, David Brian 48/22 Jennifer Avenue Runaway Bay, QLD 4216 / AU | For all designated states Morris, Terence, Edward 9 Ouyan Street Bundall, QLD 4217 / AU | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Willquist, Bo Willquist & Partners Patentbyra AB, Platensgatan 9 C 582 20 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 98921271.7 | 19.05.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998AU00364 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO06886 | 19.05.1997 Original published format: AU PO688697 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852876 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017635 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1017635 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1017635 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/48, F16L55/24 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C02F1/48 (EP);
C02F2201/483 (EP);
C02F2303/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | VERHINDERUNG DES ZELLWACHSTUMS IN EINEM GEWÄSSER | [2000/28] | English: | REMOVAL OF CELL GROWTH FROM A BODY OF WATER | [2000/28] | French: | SUPPRESSION DE LA PROLIFERATION CELLULAIRE DANS UN PLAN D'EAU | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 08.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 04.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06118401.6 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | BE | 21.02.2007 | CH | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | FR | 21.02.2007 | IT | 21.02.2007 | LI | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | LU | 19.05.2007 | IE | 21.05.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4065386 (RIGBY ROBERT ALEXANDER) [A] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3443810 (PILGRIMM HERBERT) [A] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5037546 (JANCZAK ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,7,8* the whole document *; | [A]GB2250221 (TARNPURE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2261834 (AVONCOURT ENVIRONMENTAL CARE L [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9508510 (STEFANINI DANIEL [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO9736828 (ZINDEL KNUD [DK], et al) [AP] 1,2,4,7,8 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH0780467 ; | [A]US3753886 (MYERS R, et al); | [X]US4524079 (HOFMANN GUNTER A [US]); | [X]GB2240732 (BEN CHEN [CN], et al); | [X]WO9308127 (PATENTS PENDING LIMITED [GB]); | [X]WO9407790 (BARNES CLIVE [AU], et al); | [A]US5326530 (BRIDGES JACK E [US]); | [A]US5326446 (BINGER LARRY [US]); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 21, Database accession no. 1995-158144, XP002948735 & JPH0780467 A 19950328 (GASTER KK) |