EP1089869 - MACHINE FOR MAKING AIR CUSHIONS FOR PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Best-Pack S.A. mat. d'Emballage Z.I., En Bovery 1868 Collombey / CH | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOREILLON, Alain Route de l'Etang CH-1971 Grimisuat / CH | [2001/15] | Application number, filing date | 98921315.2 | 28.05.1998 | [2001/15] | WO1998CH00226 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961232 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089869 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089869 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B31D5/00, B65B9/13, B65D81/05, B29C65/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
B31D5/0073 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/4312 (EP);
B29C66/439 (EP);
B29C66/8221 (EP);
B29C66/8242 (EP);
B29C66/83241 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LUFTKISSEN FÜR VERPACKUNG | [2001/15] | English: | MACHINE FOR MAKING AIR CUSHIONS FOR PACKAGING | [2001/15] | French: | MACHINE A FABRIQUER DES COUSSINS D'AIR POUR L'EMBALLAGE | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2001 | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2003 | GB | 16.04.2003 | NL | 16.04.2003 | BE | 31.05.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/22] | AT | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 16.04.2003 | |
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 16.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DY]JPH07165267 ; | [DA]JPH0716961 ; | [A]FR1095220 (DOYEN ET DOYEN) [A] 1; | [A]US3738210 (FUJIO M)[A] 1; | [A]FR2603019 (SCHEIDEGGER ALBERT [FR]) [A] 1; | [A]WO9407678 (KLERK S PLASTIC IND B V [NL], et al) [A] 1; | [A]WO9626137 (SCHRAM HENDRIK [NL]) [A] 1; | [A]US5660662 (TESTONE ANTHONY O [US]) [A] 1; | [Y]EP0836926 (C P S B V [NL], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 6, line 22 - line 25 * * column 4, line 13 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07165267 A 19950627 (SHIN NIPPON:KK) [DY] 1,2 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, & JP07016961 A 19950120 (SHIN NIPPON:KK) [DA] 1 * abstract * |