EP0966704 - PROGRAMMABLE DEVICE FOR DISTRIBUTING ELECTRICAL CONTROL SIGNALS TO TECHNICAL APPLIANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÖHLER, Harald Fritz-von-Röth-Strasse 9 D-90409 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
LENZ, Christian Kortenredder 18 D-22397 Hamburg / DE | [1999/52] | Application number, filing date | 98921356.6 | 13.03.1998 | [1999/52] | WO1998DE00754 | Priority number, date | DE1997110521 | 14.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19710521 | [1999/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841909 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966704 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0966704 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25428 (EP,US);
Y10S715/965 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/52] | Title | German: | PROGRAMMIERBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERTEILUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN STEUERSIGNALEN AN TECHNISCHE GERÄTE | [1999/52] | English: | PROGRAMMABLE DEVICE FOR DISTRIBUTING ELECTRICAL CONTROL SIGNALS TO TECHNICAL APPLIANCES | [1999/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF PROGRAMMABLE POUR REPARTIR DES SIGNAUX DE COMMANDE ELECTRIQUES SUR DES APPAREILS TECHNIQUES | [1999/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0575148 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 23 - column 8, line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5551053 (NADOLSKI GREGORY L [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 21 - column 11, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0531435 (ALLEN BRADLEY CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 18; figures 1,16-19,30,31 *; | [Y]DE19510466 (KLASCHKA GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,6 * column 4, line 11 - column 10, line 9; figures 1-3; claims 1,17 *; | [Y] - PINTO J J, "CHICKEN-BRAIN" I/O ARCHITECTURE FOR "TRULY" DISTRIBUTED CONTROL, ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL, VOL. 48, NR. PART 02, PAGE(S) 829 - 841, (19930101), XP000435389 [Y] 1,6 * page 832 - page 834; figures 1,3 * | [A] - RUESS R, SERCOS-INTERFACE AUCH FUER SENSOREN UND AKTOREN, ELEKTRONIK, VOL. 41, NR. 20, PAGE(S) 66 - 68, 73, (19920929), XP000311737 [A] 1,6 * figures 2,4 * |