EP0966330 - APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A SINGLE- OR MULTICOMPONENT FLUID AND METHOD FOR SPRAYING SUCH A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRIX BIOPHARMACEUTICALS S.A. 200 Chaussée de Waterloo 1640 Rhode-St-Genèse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states OMRIX BIOPHARMACEUTICALS S.A. 200 Chaussée de Waterloo 1640 Rhode-St-Genése / BE | ||
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states OMRIX BIOPHARMACEUTICALS S.A. 140, Avenue Louise, B2 1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZINGER, Freddy 29 Kazan Street 43611 Raanana / IL | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1999/52] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98921394.7 | 10.03.1998 | [1999/52] | WO1998EP01381 | Priority number, date | DE1997109896 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19709896 | [1999/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9840167 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966330 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/01, B05C17/005, A61B17/00, B05B11/02, B05B7/24 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
B05C17/0133 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61M5/31581 (EP,US);
B05B11/02 (EP,US);
B05B7/2467 (EP,US);
B05C17/00553 (EP,US);
B05C17/013 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3152 (EP,US);
A61M2039/224 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/52] | Title | German: | APPLIKATOR ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINES EIN- ODER MEHRKOMPONENTEN-FLUIDS UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFSPRÜHEN EINES DERARTIGEN FLUIDS | [1999/52] | English: | APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A SINGLE- OR MULTICOMPONENT FLUID AND METHOD FOR SPRAYING SUCH A FLUID | [1999/52] | French: | APPLICATEUR PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER UN FLUIDE A UN OU PLUSIEURS CONSTITUANTS ET PROCEDE DE VAPORISATION DUDIT FLUIDE | [1999/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 03.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/35] | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2000 | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5263614 (JACOBSEN KENNETH H [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 21 *; | [A]US3782380 (VAN DER GAAST H) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - line 64 *; | [A]US4264305 (RASMUSSEN JACK D, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [X]EP0548509 (TECALEMIT GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [X] 16 * column 1, line 30 - line 36 * * claims 1,2 * |