EP0988208 - ADJUSTABLE SULKY SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lederlin, Guy 18, rue du Docteur Touati 95340 Persan / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Lederlin, Guy 45 Rue du Chef de Ville 60530 Le Mesnil en Thelle / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 98921547.0 | 16.04.1998 | [2000/13] | WO1998FR00768 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954185 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0988208 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62C1/08 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B62C1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | GEFEDERTER, MODULARER PFERDERENNWAGEN | [2000/13] | English: | ADJUSTABLE SULKY SUSPENSION | [2000/13] | French: | SULKY MODULABLE SUSPENDU | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 01.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/19] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2000 | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4078829 (DAVIS JESSE B) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4175762 (HOFFMAN HERBERT F [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4326367 (CASHMAN RICHARD J) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 12; figure 2 *; | [A]US4817975 (SARAYDAR MICHAEL [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5062652 (BURKE MERVIN G [CA]); | [X]US5183279 (ACERNO MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document *; | [E]FR2760713 (LEDERLIN GUY [FR]) [E] 1-10 * the whole document * |