EP0981726 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TYRE PRESSURE DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap-On Equipment Limited Unit 12, Horsleys Fields, King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Barbara, Lynn Sun Electric UK Limited Unit 12 Horsleys Fields King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Paul Sun Electric UK Limited Unit 12 Horsleys Fields King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB | 03 /
STOLLERY, David Sun Electric UK Limited Unit 12 Horsleys Fields King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB | 04 /
CLIFTON, Jason, Mark Sun Electric UK Limited Unit 12 Horsleys Fields King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Archer, Philip Bruce Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Archer, Philip Bruce Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98921588.4 | 15.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998GB01301 | Priority number, date | GB19970009962 | 17.05.1997 Original published format: GB 9709962 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853289 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981726 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01L17/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G01L17/005 (EP);
G01L17/00 (KR);
G01M17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | METHODE UND GERÄT ZUR REIFENLUFTDRUCKBESTIMMUNG | [2000/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TYRE PRESSURE DETERMINATION | [2000/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR DETERMINER LA PRESSION DE GONFLAGE DES PNEUS | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0380425 (UTAC UNION TECH AUTO CYCLE [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2194061 (SHELOMENTSEV T I, et al) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0756167 (SUN ELECTRIC UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 30 - line 51; figure 1 * |