EP1014874 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING TISSUE WITH MULTIPLE ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/27] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATING TISSUE WITH MULTIPLE ELECTRODES | ||
[2006/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2006/50] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings, Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Radiotherapeutics Corporation Suite 1408, 2685 Marine Way Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICHOLS, Colin, J. 1272 Goldstone Center Point, Oregon 97502 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [2006/49] |
Former [2000/27] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98922345.8 | 18.05.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US10010 | Priority number, date | US19970858414 | 19.05.1997 Original published format: US 858414 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852480 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014874 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014874 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/08, A61B18/14 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | A61B17/39 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBE MIT MEHRFACH-ELEKTRODEN | [2006/25] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING TISSUE WITH MULTIPLE ELECTRODES | [2006/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSUS A L'AIDE DE PLUSIEURS ELECTRODES | [2006/25] |
Former [2000/27] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBE MIT MEHRFACH-ELEKTRODEN | ||
Former [2000/27] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATING TISSUE WITH MULTIPLE ELECTRODES | ||
Former [2000/27] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSUS A L'AIDE DE PLUSIEURS ELECTRODES | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Request for further processing for: | 08.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2006 | Decision despatched | 14.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.12.2006 | [2007/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9629946 (UNIV NEBRASKA [US]) [A] 1,20,25 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5536267 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al); | [XP]US5683384 (GOUGH EDWARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US5507802 (IMRAN MIR A [US]) | by applicant | WO9629946 |