EP0984962 - SUBSTITUTED 4-BENZOYL-PYRAZOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, Stefan Königsberger Str. 103a D-55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | 02 /
BAUMANN, Ernst Falkenstrasse 6a D-67373 Dudenhofen / DE | 03 /
VON DEYN, Wolfgang An der Bleiche 24 D-67435 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
HILL, Regina, Luise Im Büschel 8 D-67376 Harthausen / DE | 05 /
KARDORFF, Uwe D 3.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
MAYER, Guido Gutleuthausstrasse 8 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 07 /
OTTEN, Martina Gunterstrasse 28 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08 /
RHEINHEIMER, Joachim Merziger Strasse 24 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 09 /
WAGNER, Oliver Rossinistrasse 7 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 10 /
WITSCHEL, Matthias Wittelsbachstrasse 81 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 11 /
MISSLITZ, Ulf Mandelring 74 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 12 /
WALTER, Helmut Grünstadter Strasse 82 D-67283 Obrigheim / DE | 13 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-67346 Speyer / DE | [2000/28] |
Former [2000/11] | 01 /
ENGEL, Stefan Koelerstrasse 8 D-55286 Wörrstadt / DE | ||
02 /
BAUMANN, Ernst Falkenstrasse 6a D-67373 Dudenhofen / DE | |||
03 /
VON DEYN, Wolfgang An der Bleiche 24 D-67435 Neustadt / DE | |||
04 /
HILL, Regina, Luise Ziegelofenweg 40 D-67346 Speyer / DE | |||
05 /
KARDORFF, Uwe D 3.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | |||
06 /
MAYER, Guido Gutleuthausstrasse 8 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | |||
07 /
OTTEN, Martina Gunterstrasse 28 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
08 /
RHEINHEIMER, Joachim Merziger Strasse 24 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
09 /
WAGNER, Oliver Rossinistrasse 7 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
10 /
WITSCHEL, Matthias Wittelsbachstrasse 81 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
11 /
MISSLITZ, Ulf Mandelring 74 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | |||
12 /
WALTER, Helmut Grünstadter Strasse 82 D-67283 Obrigheim / DE | |||
13 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-67346 Speyer / DE | Application number, filing date | 98922797.0 | 04.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998EP02622 | Priority number, date | DE1997119387 | 07.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19719387 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850379 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984962 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984962 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/10, A01N43/56, C07D493/04, C07D303/38, C07D305/06, // (C07D493/04, 305:00, 305:00) | [2000/11] | CPC: |
C07D405/10 (EP,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/11] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 4-BENZOYL-PYRAZOLE | [2000/11] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 4-BENZOYL-PYRAZOLES | [2000/11] | French: | 4-BENZOYLE-PYRAZOLS SUBSTITUES | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0352543 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 22 * * page 24, line 42; table 3 *; | [A]EP0352675 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-12* page 9; example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9626206 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 18, line 38 - page 19, line 33 * |