EP0979165 - COMPOSITE PLASTIC MATERIAL TOE CAPS FOR SECURITY SHOES, AND FABRICATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JALLATTE S.A. F-30170 Saint-Hippolyte-du-Fort / FR | [2000/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARMIER, Jean 32, avenue Carnot F-78500 Sartrouville / FR | 02 /
CREYSSON, Olivier 19, allée des Gros Chênes F-78480 Verneuil sur Seine / FR | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Brema-Loyer 161, rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/03] | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Cabinet Brema, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/07] | Dawidowicz, Armand Cabinet Dawidowicz, 18, Boulevard Péreire 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98922894.5 | 29.04.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998FR00860 | Priority number, date | FR19970005378 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: FR 9705378 | FR19970005535 | 06.05.1997 Original published format: FR 9705535 | [2000/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848999 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979165 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979165 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/515, A43B23/16 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
B29D35/12 (EP);
A43B23/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | ZEHENKAPPE FÜR SICHERHEITSSCHUHE AUS KUNSTOFF-KOMPOSIT MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2003/40] | English: | COMPOSITE PLASTIC MATERIAL TOE CAPS FOR SECURITY SHOES, AND FABRICATION PROCESS | [2000/07] | French: | EMBOUTS POUR CHAUSSURES DE SECURITE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE COMPOSITE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/07] |
Former [2000/07] | ZEHENKAPPE FÜR SICHERHEITSSCHUHE AUS KUNSTOFF-KOMPOSIT MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 16.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2004 | FI | 03.03.2004 | GB | 03.03.2004 | IE | 03.03.2004 | IT | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | LU | 29.04.2004 | BE | 30.04.2004 | CH | 30.04.2004 | LI | 30.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | GR | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | DE | 04.06.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/28] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 29.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 29.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
SE | 03.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06141908 ; | [A]US1817287 (BELL DONALD H) [A] 1-4,22,25* the whole document *; | [Y]US2685104 (ISAAC GOODFELLOW) [Y] 1-6,9-14,17,22,25 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1388949 (FREUDENBERG CARL) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [DY]US3975840 (JUZENKO MAURICE J) [DY] 1-6,9-14,17,22,25 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 56; figures 2,3 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 21; figures 4-8 * * column 6, line 22 - line 30; figure 9 *; | [DA]GB2050144 (LSB ORTHOPAEDICS LTD) [DA] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5560985 (WATANABE SHOICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940823), vol. 018, no. 451, Database accession no. (C - 1241), & JP06141908 A 19940524 (MIDORI ANZEN CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * abstract * |