EP0987273 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ANTIFUNGAL V-28-3M [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAOKA, Noriyasu Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Labs 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Kenzo Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Tokai Plant 1730, Oaza Hinaga Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0885 / JP | 03 /
YATAGAI, Masanobu Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Labs 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2000/12] | Application number, filing date | 98923090.9 | 02.06.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998JP02439 | Priority number, date | JP19970145249 | 03.06.1997 Original published format: JP 14524997 | [2000/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855492 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987273 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [2000/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES FUNGZIDIES V-28-3M | [2000/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING ANTIFUNGAL V-28-3M | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE L'ANTIFONGIQUE V-28-3M | [2002/14] |
Former [2000/12] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE V-28-3M ANTIFONGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1999 | Translation filed | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/16] | 18.11.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0010297 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 16, line 18 - page 17, line 14 *; | [A] - I. LEE;Y.H. CHOI; K.W. RHYU; C.S. SHIM, "Cross interaction constants as a measure of transition state Structure. Part7. Aminolysis of Alkyl Benzenesulphonate.", J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. II, (1989), pages 1881 - 1886, XP001021389 [A] 1,2 * column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p29890001881 | International search | [Y]EP0285805 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [Y]WO8802004 (APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS [US]); | [Y]WO8800201 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]); | [Y]JPH04145066 (KITA YASUYUKI); | [Y]JPS6456683 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [A]JPS50129531 |