EP0925571 - SCROLLING SIGN WITH MANUALLY OPERATED CHANGE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILWAUKEE SIGN CO., INC. 1964 Wisconsin Avenue Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIKEN, Robert, B. 10709 Gazebo Hill Parkway East Mequon, WI 53092 / US | 02 /
CLAPPER, Robert, C. 1216 Lakefield Road Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98923391.1 | 11.05.1998 | [1999/26] | WO1998US09647 | Priority number, date | US19970853216 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: US 853216 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9850901 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0925571 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09F1/00, G09F11/29 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
G09F11/29 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/26] | G09F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | ABROLLANZEIGE MIT HANDBETÄTIGTEM WECHSELMECHANISMUS | [1999/26] | English: | SCROLLING SIGN WITH MANUALLY OPERATED CHANGE MECHANISM | [1999/26] | French: | ENSEIGNE A DEFILEMENT COMPORTANT UN MECANISME PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER DES MODIFICATIONS MANUELLEMENT | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 07.01.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/26] | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US1009543 (MEHLHORN HENRY [US], et al); | [A]US1872145 (HURFORD EBENEZER B); | [A]US5412893 (AIKEN SR ROBERT B [US]) |