EP0986382 - RAF KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06516-4175 / US | For all designated states ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Building A, 3031 Research Drive Richmond, CA 94806 / US | [2008/26] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06516-4175 / US | ||
For all designated states ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Building A, 3031 Research Drive Richmond, CA 94806 / US | |||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | ||
For all designated states ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Building A, 3031 Research Drive Richmond, CA 94806 / US | |||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | ||
For all designated states ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS 3031 Research Drive, Building A Richmond, CA 94806-5206 / US | |||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06512-4175 / US | ||
For all designated states ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS 3031 Research Drive, Building A Richmond, CA 94806-5206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOD, Jill, E. 72 Pickwick Road Hamden, CT 06517 / US | 02 /
WILD, Hanno Ausblick 128 D-42133 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
ROGERS, Daniel, H. 1333 Caminto Septimo San Diego, CA 92007 / US | 04 /
LYONS, John 2038 Ascot Drive B Moraga, CA 94556 / US | 05 /
KATZ, Michael, E. 12 Huelstede Lane Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | 06 /
CARINGAL, Yolanda, V. 14 Stone Ridge Lane Branford, CT 06405 / US | 07 /
DALLY, Robert 86 Allikat Way East Haven, CT 06512 / US | 08 /
LEE, Wendy 282 Evergreen Avenue Hamden, CT 06518 / US | 09 /
SMITH, Roger, A. 65 Winterhill Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | 10 /
BLUM, Cheri, L. 3005 Madison Street Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98923601.3 | 21.05.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US10376 | Priority number, date | US19970863021 | 23.05.1997 Original published format: US 863021 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852559 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986382 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986382 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/34, A61K31/38, A61K31/385, A61K31/40, A61K31/405, A61K31/415, A61K31/425, C07C275/26, C07D207/30, C07D209/08, C07D417/12, C07D207/34, C07D307/68, C07D333/38, C07D409/12, A61K31/41 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D207/34 (EP);
C07D307/68 (EP);
C07D333/38 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/12] | A61K31/34, A61K31/38, A61K31/385, A61K31/40, A61K31/405, A61K31/415, A61K31/425, C07C275/26, C07D207/30, C07D209/08, C07D231/38, C07D277/44, C07D285/135, C07D307/52, C07D409/12, C07D411/12, C07D417/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | RAF KINASE HEMMER | [2000/14] | English: | RAF KINASE INHIBITORS | [2000/12] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE RAF KINASE | [2000/12] |
Former [2000/12] | RAF KINASE INHIBITOREN | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - T. MURATA ET. AL., "Facile Synthesis of New Pyrrolo[3,4-d]pyrimidine-2,4-diones.", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1974), vol. 22, pages 1212 - 3, XP000973679 [A] 8 * page 1212, compound no. 2 * | [A] - M.T. GARCIA-LOPEZ ET. AL., "New Routes for the Synthesis of Pyrrolo[3,2-d] and [2,3-d]-pyrimidine Systems Starting from a Common Pyrrole Derivative", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANS. 1,, (1978), vol. 1978, pages 483 - 7, XP000973638 [A] 8 * page 485, compound no. 6d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19780000483 | International search | [Y]EP0676395 ; | [Y]WO9640673 (SUGEN INC [US]); | [A]US5597719 (FREED ELLEN [US], et al); | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19000101), Database accession no. 124:86809, XP002911710 & EP0676395 A 00000000 |