EP0993626 - PHOTOTHERMOGRAPHIC ELEMENT WITH IRIDIUM AND COPPER DOPED SILVER HALIDE GRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Chaofeng P.O. Box 64898 Saint Paul, MN 55164-0898 / US | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/16] | Parent, Yves KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98923734.2 | 26.05.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998US10616 | Priority number, date | US19970881407 | 24.06.1997 Original published format: US 881407 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859279 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993626 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993626 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/498, G03C1/09, G03C1/035 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G03C1/035 (EP,US);
G03C1/09 (EP,US);
G03C1/49818 (EP,US);
G03C1/08 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03535 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03594 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/21] |
Former [2000/16] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | PHOTOTHERMOGRAPHISCHES ELEMENT MIT IRIDIUM- UND KUPFER-DOPIERTEN SILBERHALOGENIDKÖRNERN | [2000/16] | English: | PHOTOTHERMOGRAPHIC ELEMENT WITH IRIDIUM AND COPPER DOPED SILVER HALIDE GRAINS | [2000/16] | French: | ELEMENT PHOTOTHERMOGRAPHIQUE RENFERMANT DES GRAINS D'HALOGENURE D'ARGENT DOPES AVEC DU CUIVRE ET DE L'IRIDIUM | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2063499 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 25 - line 46; claims 1,2 * * page 4, line 6 *; | [A]EP0541067 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 46 - line 51; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US5434043 (ZOU CHAOFENG [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 4; claim 1 * |