EP1072138 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FINE FREQUENCY SYNCHRONIZATION IN MULTI-CARRIER DEMODULATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERLEIN, Ernst Waldstrasse 28b D-91091 Grossenseebach / DE | 02 /
BADRI, Sabah Sebaldusstrasse 8 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
LIPP, Stefan Steinweg 9 a D-91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
BUCHHOLZ, Stephan Kerschlacher Strasse 8 D-81447 München / DE | 05 /
HEUBERGER, Albert Hausäckerweg 18 D-91056 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
GERHÄUSER, Heinz Saugendorf 17 D-91344 Waischenfeld / DE | [2002/01] |
Former [2001/05] | 01 /
EBERLEIN, Ernst Waldstrasse 28b D-91091 Gro enseebach / DE | ||
02 /
BADRI, Sabah Sebaldusstrasse 8 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | |||
03 /
LIPP, Stefan Steinweg 9 a D-91058 Erlangen / DE | |||
04 /
BUCHHOLZ, Stephan Kerschlacher Strasse 8 D-81447 München / DE | |||
05 /
HEUBERGER, Albert Hausäckerweg 18 D-91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
06 /
GERHÄUSER, Heinz Saugendorf 17 D-91344 Waischenfeld / DE | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98924116.1 | 14.04.1998 | [2001/05] | WO1998EP02184 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953667 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072138 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1072138 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
H04L27/266 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L27/2679 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR FEINEN FREQUENZSYNCHRONISIERUNG IN MEHRTRÄGERDEMODULATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2001/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FINE FREQUENCY SYNCHRONIZATION IN MULTI-CARRIER DEMODULATION SYSTEMS | [2001/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SYNCHRONISATION PRECISE DES FREQUENCES DANS DES SYSTEMES DE DEMODULATION A PORTEUSES MULTIPLES | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 10.11.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.04.2003 | [2015/21] |
Former [2007/17] | CY | 14.04.2003 | |
LU | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | CY | 14.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9205646 (NAT TRANSCOMMUNICATIONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-18 * page 9, line 1 - line 14 * * page 9, line 21 - line 28 * * page 10, line 1 - line 11 * * page 28, line 2 - line 8 * * page 4, line 14 - line 18 * * page 4 *; | [A]WO9800946 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 18, line 8 - line 11 * * page 18, line 28 - page 19, line 10 * * page 27, line 3 - line 13 * * page 36, line 22 - page 37, line 15 *; | [A]EP0822682 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 8 *; | [A] - KELLER; HANZO, "Orthogonal frequency division muliplex synchronisation techniques for wireless local area networks", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, New York, US, (19961015), pages 963 - 967, XP002063294 [A] 1-18 * page 965, column R, paragraph 3 - page 966, column L, paragraph 2 * | [AD] - MOOSE, "A technique for orthogonal frequency division multiplexing frequency offset correction", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS., NEW YORK, US, (199410), vol. 42, no. 10, pages 2908 - 2914, XP002019915 [AD] 1-4,9-12 * page 2910, column R - page 2911, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.328961 |