EP0981351 - USE OF DIPHOSPHONIC ACIDS OR THE PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS OR ESTERS THEREOF IN THE PREVENTIVE TREATMENT OF AFTER-EFFECTS RESULTING FROM ENLARGEMENT OR REPLACEMENT OF THE BLADDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUSS, Frieder Rottstrasse 11 D-67141 Neuhofen / DE | 02 /
BRKOVIC, Drasko Im Bubenwingert 25 D-69181 Leimen / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Witte, Hubert Grenzacherstrasse, 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Witte, Hubert, Dr. 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98924293.8 | 08.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998EP02712 | Priority number, date | DE1997119680 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19719680 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851314 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981351 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981351 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/66 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/663 (EP,US);
A61P13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/09] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DIPHOSPHONSÄUREN ODER DEREN PHYSIOLOGISCH VERTRÄGLICHEN SALZEN ODER ESTERN ZUR PRÄVENTIVEN BEHANDLUNG VON SPÄTFOLGEN BEI HARNBLASENERWEITERUNG ODER HARNBLASENERSATZ | [2000/09] | English: | USE OF DIPHOSPHONIC ACIDS OR THE PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS OR ESTERS THEREOF IN THE PREVENTIVE TREATMENT OF AFTER-EFFECTS RESULTING FROM ENLARGEMENT OR REPLACEMENT OF THE BLADDER | [2000/09] | French: | UTILISATION D'ACIDES DIPHOSPHONIQUES OU DE LEURS SELS OU ESTERS PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT TOLERABLES POUR LE TRAITEMENT PREVENTIF DES SEQUELLES TARDIVES EN CAS D'AGRANDISSEMENT VESICAL OU DE REMPLACEMENT VESICAL | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07330613 ; | [A]EP0531253 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 6 *; | [Y]EP0566535 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 6, line 12 - line 22 *; | [A]WO9414455 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO9619998 (GADOR SA [AR], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO9635407 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [YD] - MUNDY ET AL., "Calcium balance, growth and skeletal mineralisation in patients with cystoplasties", BRITISH JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (1992), vol. 69, pages 257 - 259, XP002076297 [YD] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 08, Database accession no. 96-074761, XP002076298 & JPH07330613 A 00000000 (TEIJIN LTD.) [A] * abstract * |