EP1028646 - STOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niemi, Tapio Valtatie 216 99100 Kittilä / FI | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Heinänen, Pekka Antero, et al Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Ayritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Heinänen, Pekka Antero, et al Heinänen Oy, Patenttitoimisto/Patent Agency, Annankatu 31-33 C 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98924340.7 | 02.06.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998FI00471 | Priority number, date | FI19970004044 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: FI 974044 | [2000/34] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921465 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028646 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47J33/00, F24B1/26 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A47J36/2477 (EP);
F24B5/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | OFEN | [2000/34] | English: | STOVE | [2000/34] | French: | FOURNEAU | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1998 | Translation filed | 16.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9633109 ; | [Y]DE3128298 ; | [Y]US5503138 ; | [A]US4471751 ; | [A]US4915091 |