EP0983146 - PRINTER FOR OFFICE EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAUCHE, Gilles 53, boulevard Clemenceau F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
LEYLDE, Philippe 32, boulevard de l'évasion F-95800 Cergy le Haut / FR | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98924376.1 | 05.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998FR00898 | Priority number, date | FR19970005543 | 06.05.1997 Original published format: FR 9705543 | [2000/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850236 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983146 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983146 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/54, G06K15/10 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/233 (EP);
B41J3/546 (EP);
G06K15/02 (EP);
H04N1/2307 (EP);
H04N1/2361 (EP);
G06K2215/0082 (EP);
G06K2215/0094 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/10] | Title | German: | DRUCKER FÜR BÜROAUSSTATTUNG | [2000/10] | English: | PRINTER FOR OFFICE EQUIPMENT | [2000/10] | French: | IMPRIMANTE POUR APPAREIL DE BUREAU | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 18.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0674289 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 40 - column 19, line 33; figure - *; | [A]JPH0865532 ; | [DA]EP0361780 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [DA] 1-7 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 10 *; | [A]US5081596 (VINCENT KENT [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 34; figures 1,2; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 096, no. 007, & JP08065532 A 19960308 (CANON INC) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0361780 |