EP0921431 - PHOTOGRAPHIC PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1, Umehara, Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1, Umehara, Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTOOKA, Eiji Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1, Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Masaaki Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1, Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | 03 /
AIZAWA, Toshihiko Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1, Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | Hertel, Werner, Dipl.-Phys. Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98924627.7 | 16.06.1998 | [1999/23] | WO1998JP02631 | Priority number, date | JP19970160081 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16008197 | JP19970160082 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16008297 | JP19970160274 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16027497 | JP19970160273 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16027397 | [1999/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858292 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921431 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921431 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/32, G03B27/46, G03B27/52 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
G03B27/32 (EP,US);
G03B27/587 (EP,US);
G03B2227/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/23] | Title | German: | PHOTOGRAPHISCHES ENTWICKLUNGSGERÄT | [1999/23] | English: | PHOTOGRAPHIC PROCESSOR | [1999/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEVELOPPEMENT DE PHOTOGRAPHIES | [1999/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1999 | Translation filed | 11.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/21] | CH | 15.09.2004 | |
LI | 15.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0629904 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 6 - column 12; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0628852 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 10 - column 24; figures 1-20 * | International search | [Y]JPH08166640 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JPH02207236 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06266020 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD); | [A]JPH0566644U ; | [A]JPH0882874 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JPS62296679 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]JPS62184867 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]JPS6358332 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |